U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00197-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cropper
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • August 23, 2022: [Stay]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 30, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 28, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 23, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 16, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 13, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 22, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 09, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 09, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Transcript]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • September 10, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • September 08, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 08, 2021: [Bond]
  • September 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 08, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 23, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 18, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 18, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.