U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00198-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burgess
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Response - other]
  • July 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • May 18, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 18, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • May 10, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • May 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 14, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 10, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 09, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 15, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 08, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 06, 2021: [Transcript]
  • October 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • October 01, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 01, 2021: [Bond]
  • October 01, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Bond]
  • September 30, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • September 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 27, 2021: [Arrest]
  • September 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 18, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 18, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.