U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00199-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Otuel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2025
  • February 27, 2025: [Transcript - Voir Dire]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 07, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 18, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 11, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 09, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • April 13, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • April 04, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 14, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • January 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • January 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 06, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • January 04, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 04, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2022: [Arrest]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 18, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 18, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.