U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00200-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carrothers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • October 04, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 20, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 04, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • November 22, 2021: [Show Cause Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 28, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 28, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • October 27, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 25, 2021: [Status Conference]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 09, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 08, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • September 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 02, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • September 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • September 02, 2021: [Arrest]
  • September 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 18, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 18, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.