U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • September 16, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • March 01, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • March 01, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 01, 2022: [Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 07, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 12, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 12, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 04, 2021: [Factual Basis]
August, 2021
  • August 28, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • August 23, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 23, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 23, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • August 23, 2021: [Arrest]
  • August 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 18, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 18, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.