U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00206-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thorbourne
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 16, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 09, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • December 07, 2022: [Sentencing]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • February 24, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • February 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 16, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • December 16, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 15, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 07, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 07, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • September 03, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 02, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • September 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 02, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • September 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 02, 2021: [Arrest]
  • September 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 18, 2021: [Indictment]
  • August 18, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.