U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00207-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arriola Zuniga
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 16, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 07, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 07, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • December 02, 2021: [Factual Basis]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • September 24, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • September 24, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • September 24, 2021: [Arrest]
  • September 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 18, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 18, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.