U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00208-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 17, 2023: [Pretrial Report]
  • January 17, 2023: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • January 17, 2023: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 17, 2023: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • January 17, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 17, 2023: [Arrest]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • December 07, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • November 17, 2021: [Indictment]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • August 18, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 18, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.