U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00210-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Avila-Aguilar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • February 02, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • February 02, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 01, 2022: [Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 14, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 14, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 14, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 08, 2021: [Factual Basis]
August, 2021
  • August 28, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 24, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • August 23, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 23, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 23, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • August 23, 2021: [Arrest]
  • August 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 18, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 18, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.