U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00211-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCoy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 25, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 18, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 10, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 08, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Insanity Defense]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 05, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 20, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 17, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 16, 2021: [Bond]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • September 16, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • September 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 15, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • September 13, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 13, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 13, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 13, 2021: [Arrest]
  • September 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 18, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.