U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nance et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 02, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • June 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 16, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 10, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 09, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • June 09, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • June 09, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • June 09, 2022: [Medical Records]
  • June 08, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • June 07, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 06, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • June 06, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • February 04, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • February 04, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 25, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • January 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 04, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 09, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 26, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • October 26, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 22, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 22, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • October 21, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • October 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 13, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • October 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 22, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • September 14, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • September 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 10, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 23, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 20, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 19, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 19, 2021: [Bond]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • August 19, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Community Defender]
  • August 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • August 19, 2021: [Arrest]
  • August 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 18, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 18, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.