U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. James et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Vacate (2255)]
October, 2022
  • October 10, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
  • September 06, 2022: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
  • September 06, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Appeal Filing Fee Received]
  • August 17, 2022: [Case Number - USCA]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • August 12, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 11, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 11, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 01, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • July 29, 2022: [Seal Document]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 24, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 18, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • April 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • April 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • April 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • April 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [JERS Exhibits]
  • February 24, 2022: [Jury Verdict]
  • February 22, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Returning Trial Exhibits]
  • February 22, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • February 22, 2022: [Witness List]
  • February 21, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 15, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • February 15, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 15, 2022: [Proposed Jury Verdict]
  • February 10, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 08, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • February 08, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • February 02, 2022: [Request for Notice of Alibi/Insanity Defense]
  • February 02, 2022: [Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 02, 2022: [Factual Basis]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 20, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Filing]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 29, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • November 24, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • November 24, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • November 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice - Out of State Counsel]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 15, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • November 03, 2021: [Arrest - Other District]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 28, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • September 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 16, 2021: [Bond]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • September 08, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • September 08, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • August 25, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 23, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 23, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 23, 2021: [Arrest]
  • August 18, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 18, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.