U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Southard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • February 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 17, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 10, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 07, 2021: [Service by Publication]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • October 06, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 06, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 29, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • August 25, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 25, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order Terminating Attorney]
  • August 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 24, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 23, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 20, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 20, 2021: [Arrest]
  • August 18, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • August 18, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.