U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00316-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Solomon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice-other]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Sentencing ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Statement Regarding Substantial Assistance]
  • November 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • July 07, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 07, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 24, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • January 13, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • January 13, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 13, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 13, 2022: [Information - Felony]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 08, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order]
  • August 20, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 18, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 18, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 18, 2021: [Text Order]
  • August 18, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 18, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 18, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • August 18, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.