U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00282-1
  • Case Name: USA v. OLLA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order On Probation Petition 12A]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [USPO PROB 12A - Report of Offender]
  • November 30, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Supervision]
  • October 03, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 27, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [SEALED USPO Response - Defendant Motion for Early Term]
  • September 14, 2022: [Early Termination of Supervision]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Order On Probation Petition 12A]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order]
  • January 03, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • December 15, 2021: [USPO PROB 12A - Report of Offender]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • August 17, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release/Probation Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.