U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barker, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2025: [Hearing Re Garnishment]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment/Execution and Instructions]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order/Writ on Motion for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • March 18, 2025: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 18, 2025: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Letter]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • January 23, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 23, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 19, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • January 18, 2023: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 17, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 17, 2023: [Withdraw Document]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • January 16, 2023: [Seal Document]
  • January 16, 2023: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • January 13, 2023: [Redacted Document]
  • January 13, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 13, 2023: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • January 11, 2023: [Continue Other]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 10, 2023: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 10, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 04, 2023: [Seal Document]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • December 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 20, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 20, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • December 15, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 15, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • December 15, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 13, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • December 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • December 11, 2022: [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 09, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • December 08, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 05, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • December 05, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 05, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 02, 2022: [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 01, 2022: [Sentencing]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • November 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • November 22, 2022: [Service by Publication]
  • November 22, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 21, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • November 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 17, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 16, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • November 10, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • November 10, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • November 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
  • October 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 26, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • September 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 21, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • September 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 16, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • September 15, 2022: [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 15, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • September 14, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • September 14, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • September 14, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • September 11, 2022: [Seal]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 09, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • September 09, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • September 09, 2022: [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 02, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • August 30, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • August 29, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • August 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 29, 2022: [Seal]
  • August 29, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • August 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 25, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 25, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 24, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • August 24, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 24, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 23, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • August 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • August 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 22, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • August 22, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 19, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 19, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Inquiry of Counsel]
  • August 19, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 15, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • August 15, 2022: [Memorandum]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 15, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • August 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • August 12, 2022: [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 11, 2022: [Inquiry of Counsel]
  • August 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • August 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • August 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • August 08, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • August 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • August 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 08, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 04, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 04, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 03, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 28, 2022: [Sealed Motion - USA only]
  • July 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 18, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • July 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 15, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
  • July 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • July 01, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 29, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • June 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • June 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • June 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 27, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 27, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • June 27, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 27, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 24, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 23, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • June 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 23, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 22, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • June 22, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 22, 2022: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • June 22, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 22, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • June 21, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 20, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • June 20, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • June 17, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 15, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 14, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 13, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • June 13, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 13, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 10, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • June 10, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 10, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • June 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 08, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 07, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • June 07, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • June 07, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • June 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • June 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • June 06, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • June 01, 2022: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 01, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 01, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • June 01, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 01, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 29, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • May 27, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • May 27, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • May 27, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • May 25, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • May 25, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • May 25, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • May 25, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 24, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • May 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 23, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Objection to Memorandum and Recommendations]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • May 16, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • May 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 13, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Memorandum and Recommendations]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • May 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • May 11, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • May 11, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • May 11, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • May 05, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • May 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Memorandum and Recommendations]
  • April 25, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 25, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 25, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 25, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 22, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • April 22, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 22, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • April 21, 2022: [Memorandum and Recommendations]
  • April 21, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 20, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • April 20, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • April 20, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • April 19, 2022: [Information to Establish Prior Conviction]
  • April 19, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • April 19, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
  • April 14, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 13, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • April 13, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • April 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • April 12, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 12, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • April 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 11, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 08, 2022: [Objection to Memorandum and Recommendations]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 08, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • April 08, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 08, 2022: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • April 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • April 06, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • April 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2022: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Bond]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 28, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 28, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • March 28, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 28, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 25, 2022: [Memorandum and Recommendations]
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • March 24, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • March 24, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Memorandum and Recommendations]
  • March 22, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • March 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 21, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • March 21, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 21, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 17, 2022: [Transcript]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • March 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 09, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • March 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
  • March 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 04, 2022: [Suppress]
  • March 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 04, 2022: [Bond]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • March 02, 2022: [Objection to Memorandum and Recommendations]
  • March 01, 2022: [Release from Custody]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 25, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 22, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 22, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 18, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • February 18, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • February 18, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • February 18, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • February 17, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
  • February 17, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 16, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 16, 2022: [Memorandum and Recommendations]
  • February 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • February 11, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • February 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 07, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time re: Other]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 02, 2022: [Bond]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • February 01, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Extension of Time re: Other]
  • January 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 29, 2022: [Transcript]
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • January 26, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • January 25, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • January 25, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
  • January 24, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • January 21, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • January 21, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • January 21, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • January 21, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • January 18, 2022: [Transcript]
  • January 18, 2022: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 18, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • January 15, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 12, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • January 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order to Seal Document]
  • January 10, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 10, 2022: [Sealed Response to Motion]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 07, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • January 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 04, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 02, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 29, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 28, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 20, 2021: [Suppress]
  • December 20, 2021: [Discovery]
  • December 20, 2021: [Transcript]
  • December 20, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 17, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 17, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • December 17, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 17, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • December 17, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 15, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • December 14, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • December 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 13, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • December 13, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • December 13, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • December 10, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 10, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 10, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 10, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 10, 2021: [Arrest]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 09, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • December 09, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 08, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order]
  • December 05, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 05, 2021: [Suppress]
  • December 02, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • December 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and M&R Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • November 29, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 22, 2021: [Bond]
  • November 17, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 05, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 05, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 02, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 27, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 26, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 22, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 22, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 22, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 20, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 20, 2021: [Bond]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 20, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • October 19, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 19, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • October 19, 2021: [ProbBond Warrant - Order on Bond Violation Report]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 18, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 18, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 18, 2021: [Mandate - USCA]
  • October 15, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 14, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 13, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time re: Other]
  • October 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • October 12, 2021: [Extension of Time re: Other]
  • October 12, 2021: [Suppress]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 08, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 08, 2021: [Addendum To Violation Report (PreTrial)]
  • October 07, 2021: [ProbBond Warrant - Order on Bond Violation Report]
  • October 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 06, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 04, 2021: [Bond]
  • October 01, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 01, 2021: [Bond]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order of Detention]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 27, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • September 27, 2021: [Bond]
  • September 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 24, 2021: [Arrest]
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • September 21, 2021: [Case Number - USCA]
  • September 21, 2021: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • September 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 20, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • September 20, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Conditions of Release - USCA]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order]
  • September 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • September 17, 2021: [Expedite]
  • September 16, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 16, 2021: [Transcript]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 15, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • September 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 15, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • September 15, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • September 15, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 15, 2021: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • September 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • September 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • September 15, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • September 14, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 14, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 13, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 13, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 10, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 08, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • September 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • September 03, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 03, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • September 02, 2021: [Bond]
  • September 01, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 31, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • August 30, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 30, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 30, 2021: [Bond]
  • August 28, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • August 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 25, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 25, 2021: [Bond]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 25, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 25, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 25, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • August 25, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 25, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 24, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • August 24, 2021: [Transcript]
  • August 24, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • August 24, 2021: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • August 23, 2021: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court]
  • August 23, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 23, 2021: [Hearing]
  • August 23, 2021: [Travel]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 23, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • August 23, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 23, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • August 23, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 20, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 20, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 20, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • August 20, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 20, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • August 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 20, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 19, 2021: [Arrest]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • August 19, 2021: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court]
  • August 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 19, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • August 19, 2021: [Arrest - Other District]
  • August 19, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 19, 2021: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 18, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • August 18, 2021: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • August 18, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 18, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 18, 2021: [Bond]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 18, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 18, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • August 18, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 18, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 18, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 18, 2021: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • August 17, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 17, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • August 17, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 16, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 16, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 16, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 16, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 16, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 16, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • August 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 15, 2021: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.