U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 04, 2022: [Sentencing]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 01, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • February 11, 2022: [Service by Publication]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • February 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 10, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • December 10, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 10, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • December 02, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • December 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 20, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time re: Other]
  • September 24, 2021: [Extension of Time re: Other]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • August 25, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 25, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • August 23, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 16, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 16, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 15, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • August 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 15, 2021: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.