U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • December 10, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 10, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • November 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 10, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
February, 2022
  • February 26, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea]
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 06, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • December 06, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 06, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • December 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • November 03, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 03, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • November 03, 2021: [Factual Basis]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • October 21, 2021: [Continue Other]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 08, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 03, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty]
  • September 02, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty]
  • September 01, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • September 01, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • September 01, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • August 31, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 30, 2021: [Vacate]
  • August 30, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 30, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • August 30, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 28, 2021: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • August 28, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 28, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 26, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 26, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 25, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 25, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 25, 2021: [Arrest]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 16, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.