U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00333
  • Case Name: First American Bank v. Kashi Hospitality LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 11, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 10, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 09, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Appendix/Supplement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.