U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00011
  • Case Name: Planet Fitness International Franchise v. JEG-United, LLC
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • December 19, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Contempt]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Contempt]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 19, 2022: [Surreply to Reply]
  • April 18, 2022: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2022: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • April 13, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 07, 2022: [Leave to File]
  • April 01, 2022: [Attorney Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 31, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 30, 2022: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • March 24, 2022: [Set Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice - ECF]
  • March 24, 2022: [Transfer Case Procedural Order In]
  • March 24, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • March 22, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.