U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 15, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 14, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • June 09, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 06, 2021: [Extend Time]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 07, 2021: [Continue]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 09, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • February 05, 2021: [Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 08, 2021: [Continue Trial]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 25, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • October 20, 2020: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 06, 2020: [Continue Trial]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 18, 2020: [Continue Trial]
  • August 03, 2020: [Trial Notice]
  • August 03, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • August 03, 2020: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 23, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • July 23, 2020: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • July 23, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.