U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-00308-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hunter
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 18, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2025: [Assertion of Right to be Unshackled]
  • April 18, 2025: [Assertion of Right to Counsel]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • April 18, 2025: [Detention Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Minute Order Due Process Protections Act]
  • April 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 09, 2025: [Assign Judges in Criminal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.