U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-00307-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zimmer
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Electronic Rule 5 Transmittal]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 10, 2025: [Waiver of Rule 5c3 Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • April 09, 2025: [Minute Order Due Process Protections Act]
  • April 09, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
  • April 08, 2025: [Assign Judges in Criminal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.