U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-00293-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pena-Garcia et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Minute Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 09, 2025: [Detention Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Assertion of Right to be Unshackled]
  • April 08, 2025: [Assertion of Right to Counsel]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • April 07, 2025: [Minute Order Due Process Protections Act]
  • April 07, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Minute Order Due Process Protections Act]
  • April 04, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.