U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-00261-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kim
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Minute Order re Merged Magistrate Judge Case]
  • April 07, 2025: [Minute Order re Appeal of Magistrate Case]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motion DJ Review of MJ Release or Detention Order LCR 12-3]
  • April 01, 2025: [Designation of Retained Counsel]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • April 01, 2025: [Detention Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Assertion of Right to Counsel]
  • March 31, 2025: [Assertion of Right to be Unshackled]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 28, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 28, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 27, 2025: [Motion Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 27, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.