U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-00263-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cortez-Cruz
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 01, 2025: [Assertion of Right to Counsel]
  • April 01, 2025: [Assertion of Right to be Unshackled]
  • April 01, 2025: [BICE Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • April 01, 2025: [Detention Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Minute Order Due Process Protections Act]
  • March 31, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.