U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-00238-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Electronic Rule 5 Transmittal]
  • April 04, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Detention Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
  • March 26, 2025: [Waiver of Rule 5c3 Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Assertion of Right to Counsel]
  • March 26, 2025: [Assertion of Right to be Unshackled]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • March 20, 2025: [Commitment to Another District]
  • March 20, 2025: [Assign Judges in Criminal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.