U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-00237-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arfin
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Defendant/Case/Counts]
  • April 16, 2025: [Proposed Order Submission]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Motion Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Detention Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Assertion of Right to Counsel]
  • March 25, 2025: [Assertion of Right to be Unshackled]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • March 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2025: [Complaint]
  • March 19, 2025: [Assign Judges in Criminal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.