U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-00235-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Verdin-Covarrubias
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Detention Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Assertion of Right to be Unshackled]
  • March 26, 2025: [Assertion of Right to Counsel]
  • March 26, 2025: [BICE Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • March 26, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2025: [Complaint]
  • March 18, 2025: [Assign Judges in Criminal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.