U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-mj-00816-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Whitehead
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Stipulation]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2025: [Assertion of Right to Counsel]
  • March 19, 2025: [Bond]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2025: [Initial/ Arraignment & Plea]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.