U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00756-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Graves
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order]
  • May 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Detention Order]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.