U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-00109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Detention Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.