U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00922-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dean
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order]
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order]
  • April 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.