U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-00171-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Beasley
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reopen Detention Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Detention Order]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order]
  • March 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.