U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-00119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burton
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.