U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cwalina
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order]
  • July 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 11, 2022: [Detention Order]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.