U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-00070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Loftin
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Detention Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Commitment to Another District]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.