U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00687-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Montgomery, et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Defendant/Case/Counts]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.