U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-01027-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Montes et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Petition for Modification of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Petition for Warrant]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Petition for Warrant]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order]
  • May 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.