U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00992-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nagel
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Detention Order]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order]
  • April 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order]
  • March 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Detention Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.