U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cv-03181
  • Case Name: Silvey v. Roadrunner Temperature Controlled, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order - Text Only]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 11, 2024: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 10, 2024: [Attorney Letter]
  • October 10, 2024: [Assignment of Judges]
  • October 10, 2024: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.