U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:21-cv-00410
  • Case Name: Wesely v. Walmart, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Settlement Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order - Text Only]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • September 06, 2022: [Extend]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
June, 2022
  • June 20, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 05, 2022: [Extend]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Disclosure Document]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 14, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Setting Schedule for Initial Progression of a Civil Case]
  • November 22, 2021: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • November 16, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • November 02, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • October 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 15, 2021: [Assignment of Judges]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.