U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-03143
  • Case Name: Omaha Cellular Telephone Company v. Metropolitan Utilities District of Omaha
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • December 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Stipulation]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 14, 2022: [Stipulation]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • December 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 22, 2021: [Summons Requested]
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 22, 2021: [Assignment of Judges]
  • July 21, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.