U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:21-cv-00196
  • Case Name: Hartman v. Kijakazi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • June 16, 2022: [Response]
  • June 06, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion Reversing the Commissioner's Decision]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion Affirming the Commissioner's Decision]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Reply]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Brief]
  • December 22, 2021: [Affirming Commissioner's Decision]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Brief]
  • November 22, 2021: [Reversing Commissioner's Decision]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order - Consent (TEXT ONLY)]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
  • October 21, 2021: [Certificate]
  • October 21, 2021: [Social Security Administrative Record]
  • October 21, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • July 21, 2021: [Index]
  • July 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.