U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:19-cv-00314
  • Case Name: King v. Kijakazi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Mandate/Judgment]
  • October 07, 2021: [Copy of Order from USCA]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Mandate/Judgment]
  • August 03, 2021: [Opinion (Copy) of USCA]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order - Text Only]
  • July 14, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • July 13, 2021: [Substitute Party]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.