U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:21-cv-00259
  • Case Name: Bjorman v. Alegent Health - Bergan Mercy Health Systems
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 06, 2023: [Memorandum and Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 06, 2023: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • January 05, 2023: [Index]
  • January 05, 2023: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • January 05, 2023: [Brief]
  • January 05, 2023: [In Limine]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 04, 2023: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • October 13, 2022: [Response]
  • October 03, 2022: [Extend]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • September 29, 2022: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • September 29, 2022: [Index]
  • September 29, 2022: [Brief]
  • September 07, 2022: [Extend]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • August 26, 2022: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • August 26, 2022: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • August 26, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 08, 2022: [Extend]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • August 04, 2022: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 10, 2022: [Reply]
  • June 07, 2022: [Response]
  • June 01, 2022: [Certificate]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order - Text Only]
  • April 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 09, 2021: [Status Conference]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 04, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • October 18, 2021: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Email Motion]
  • September 13, 2021: [Email]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 19, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 17, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2021: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • July 19, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 13, 2021: [Assignment of Judges]
  • July 13, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.