U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:21-cv-00256
  • Case Name: JDP Holdings, LLC v. Scottsdale Indemnity Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Remark - Public]
  • March 07, 2022: [Strike Order]
  • March 04, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Certificate]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • January 17, 2022: [Amend]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Reassignment Order]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Setting Schedule for Initial Progression of a Civil Case]
  • August 23, 2021: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • July 26, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 22, 2021: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • July 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 22, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 12, 2021: [Assignment of Judges]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.