U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cv-05003
  • Case Name: Beran v. VSL North Platte Court LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 09, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 09, 2022: [Extend]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Reply Brief]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Index]
  • August 29, 2022: [Brief]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 22, 2022: [Extend]
  • August 01, 2022: [Brief]
  • August 01, 2022: [Index]
  • August 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • July 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • June 03, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
May, 2022
  • May 21, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Certificate]
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Certificate]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • May 03, 2021: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • March 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • March 23, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 12, 2021: [Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 12, 2021: [Assignment of Judges]
  • March 12, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.