U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-bk-90178
  • Case Name: DANA MICHELLE GREEN
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • January 08, 2023: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
December, 2022
  • December 24, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 24, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • December 24, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order on Application/Motion to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Add Judge]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 [Application/Motion to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.