U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00177
  • Case Name: Wright v. Cygnus Home Service, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Appear]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 01, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
  • November 01, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.